THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:35:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lbby-707 Charlotte St
Peterborough ON K9J 2X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705)876-4530
Fax: (705)743-1449

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Effective: 13 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 21 Dec 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Maternal Fetal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 21 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lbby-707 Charlotte St
Peterborough ON K9J 2X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705)876-4530
Fax: (705)743-1449

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Effective: 13 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 21 Dec 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Maternal Fetal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 21 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEAH HAZAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAZAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEAH HAZAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAZAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Nov 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2016