THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:33:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 - 955 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple Ontario L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 303 0304
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3420 Hurontario St
Mississauga ON L5B 4A9
Phone: 905-272-0165
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 400 - 3910 Bathurst St
North York ON M3H 5Z3
Phone: (416) 638-6107
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 400-3910 Bathurst St
North York ON M3H 5Z3
Phone: 416 638 6107
Fax: 416 638 9484
Address: 210-2330 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough ON M1T 0A2
Phone: 4163351717
Fax: 4163351719

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 08 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 - 955 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple Ontario L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 303 0304
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3420 Hurontario St
Mississauga ON L5B 4A9
Phone: 905-272-0165
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 400 - 3910 Bathurst St
North York ON M3H 5Z3
Phone: (416) 638-6107
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 400-3910 Bathurst St
North York ON M3H 5Z3
Phone: 416 638 6107
Fax: 416 638 9484
Address: 210-2330 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough ON M1T 0A2
Phone: 4163351717
Fax: 4163351719

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 08 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSHUA MICHAEL HOCHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOCHMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSHUA MICHAEL HOCHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOCHMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2016