THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:34:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Univ. of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: DUNDAS 427 MEDICAL CENTRE
2200 DUNDAS ST. E.
UNIT 4A
Mississauga Ontario L4X 2V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 232-0720
Fax: (905) 232-0790
Address: 5415 Dundas St W
Etobicoke ON M9B 1B5
Phone: 416-368-2177
Fax: 416-572-6881
Address: Unit 5 - 2200 Dundas Street East
Telemed MD
Mississauga Ontario L4X 2V3
Phone: 18883502323
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lina Alam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Alam (CPSO#: 111109 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Univ. of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: DUNDAS 427 MEDICAL CENTRE
2200 DUNDAS ST. E.
UNIT 4A
Mississauga Ontario L4X 2V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 232-0720
Fax: (905) 232-0790
Address: 5415 Dundas St W
Etobicoke ON M9B 1B5
Phone: 416-368-2177
Fax: 416-572-6881
Address: Unit 5 - 2200 Dundas Street East
Telemed MD
Mississauga Ontario L4X 2V3
Phone: 18883502323
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lina Alam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Alam (CPSO#: 111109 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINA ALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINA ALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Univ. of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Mar 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2016