THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:28:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 2010
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology
01 Jul 2018 to 31 Oct 2018
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology
05 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology
01 Jul 2017 to 04 Nov 2017
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology
21 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Anatomical Pathology
01 Oct 2016 to 20 Dec 2016
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Oct 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 05 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 04 Nov 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 21 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 01 Oct 2016 to 20 Dec 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2016