THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:05:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Effective: 11 Nov 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Effective: 11 Nov 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology
01 Jul 2023 to 20 Nov 2023
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology
21 Nov 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Jul 2022 to 20 Nov 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
EL - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
16 Jan 2017 to 12 Feb 2017
University of Toronto
EL - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
21 Nov 2016 to 18 Dec 2016
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 20 Nov 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 21 Nov 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 20 Nov 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 16 Jan 2017 to 12 Feb 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 21 Nov 2016 to 18 Dec 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Nov 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2016