THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Surgical Oncology
16 Jan 2017 to 12 Feb 2017
University of Toronto
EL - General Surgery
19 Dec 2016 to 15 Jan 2017
University of Ottawa
EL - Surgical Oncology
21 Nov 2016 to 18 Dec 2016
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: EL - Surgical Oncology
DATE: 16 Jan 2017 to 12 Feb 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - General Surgery
DATE: 19 Dec 2016 to 15 Jan 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Surgical Oncology
DATE: 21 Nov 2016 to 18 Dec 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Feb 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2016