THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:12:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre -
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: London Health Sciences Centre -
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre -
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: London Health Sciences Centre -
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Mar 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 07 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. YULIYA ALEXANDER may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. YULIYA ALEXANDER may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Mar 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 Sep 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Dec 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Apr 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Feb 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2017