THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:54:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 801 King Edward Avenue
Room N203 (2nd floor)
Minto Sports Complex
Ottawa Ontario K1N 6N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-562-5498
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 900 Merivale Road
Carlington Community Health Centre
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 5Z8
Phone: 613-722-2161
Fax: 613-761-1805
Address: 1365 Richmond Road
Pinecrest-Queensway Community Health Centre
Ottawa Ontario K2B 6X6
Phone: 613 820 4922
Fax: 613-820-2006
Address: 221 Nelson Street
Sandy Hill Community Health Centre
OASIS
Ottawa Ontario K1N 1C7
Phone: 613-569-3488
Fax: 613-569-3484
Address: 420 Cooper Street
Centretown Community Health Centre
Ottawa Ontario K2P 2N6
Phone: 613-233-4697
Fax: 613-233-4541

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 801 King Edward Avenue
Room N203 (2nd floor)
Minto Sports Complex
Ottawa Ontario K1N 6N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-562-5498
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 900 Merivale Road
Carlington Community Health Centre
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 5Z8
Phone: 613-722-2161
Fax: 613-761-1805
Address: 1365 Richmond Road
Pinecrest-Queensway Community Health Centre
Ottawa Ontario K2B 6X6
Phone: 613 820 4922
Fax: 613-820-2006
Address: 221 Nelson Street
Sandy Hill Community Health Centre
OASIS
Ottawa Ontario K1N 1C7
Phone: 613-569-3488
Fax: 613-569-3484
Address: 420 Cooper Street
Centretown Community Health Centre
Ottawa Ontario K2P 2N6
Phone: 613-233-4697
Fax: 613-233-4541

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VASHTI MEGHAN KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VASHTI MEGHAN KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2017