THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:24:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Pontificia Universidad Cat¢lica de Chile, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 44762
Fax: 2896670115

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 29 Aug 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Aug 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 29 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 29 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Chile

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Pontificia Universidad Cat¢lica de Chile, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 44762
Fax: 2896670115

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 29 Aug 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Aug 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 29 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 29 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Chile

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
29 Aug 2024
30 Jun 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 29 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JOSE LUIS WINTER DEL RIO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Cardiology, McMaster University, in which Dr. WINTER DEL RIO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. WINTER DEL RIO no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. WINTER DEL RIO’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. WINTER DEL RIO’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 29 August, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. WINTER DEL RIO's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JOSE LUIS WINTER DEL RIO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Cardiology, McMaster University, in which Dr. WINTER DEL RIO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. WINTER DEL RIO no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. WINTER DEL RIO’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. WINTER DEL RIO’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 29 August, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. WINTER DEL RIO's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Pontificia Universidad Cat¢lica de Chile, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2017