THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:40:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stittsville Medical Centre
1339 Stittsville Main St.
Stittsville ON K2S 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138365083
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Stittsville medical centre
1339 Stittsville Main St
Stittsville ON K2S 1C6
Phone: (613) 836-5083
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Aug 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stittsville Medical Centre
1339 Stittsville Main St.
Stittsville ON K2S 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138365083
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Stittsville medical centre
1339 Stittsville Main St
Stittsville ON K2S 1C6
Phone: (613) 836-5083
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Aug 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN PETER SAGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAGAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN PETER SAGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAGAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Mar 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2017