THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:53:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Colborne St W
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-327-9188
Fax: 705-327-5499

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pamela Newman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Newman (CPSO#: 111387 )
Business Address: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
705-327-9188

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Colborne St W
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-327-9188
Fax: 705-327-5499

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pamela Newman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Newman (CPSO#: 111387 )
Business Address: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
705-327-9188

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAMELA ANNE NEWMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAMELA ANNE NEWMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Mar 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Mar 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2017