THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:09:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Danforth Medical Centre
880 Danforth Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1K 1H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 264-4848
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-4500 Kingston Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 2N9
Phone: 4162873100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Danforth Medical Centre
880 Danforth Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1K 1H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 264-4848
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-4500 Kingston Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 2N9
Phone: 4162873100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
03 May 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 03 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Prabhjot Singh may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Prabhjot Singh may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 03 May 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Feb 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 May 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2017