THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:19:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 04 Oct 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pediatric Neurology
Effective: 04 Oct 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pediatric Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 04 Oct 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pediatric Neurology
Effective: 04 Oct 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pediatric Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
04 Oct 2021
03 Oct 2028
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 04 2021
EXPIRY DATE: Oct 03 2028
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CAROLINA GORODETSKY may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Neurology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. GORODETSKY holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. GORODETSKY no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. GORODETSKY’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. GORODETSKY’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 04 October, 2021. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 03 October, 2028.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CAROLINA GORODETSKY may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Neurology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. GORODETSKY holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. GORODETSKY no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. GORODETSKY’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. GORODETSKY’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 04 October, 2021. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 03 October, 2028.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Oct 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 03 Oct 2028

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2017