THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:07:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 129 Lincoln Rd
Central Health Consultants
Grand Falls-Windsor NL A2A 1P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Union St
Central Newfoundland Regional Health Centre
Grand Falls-Windsor NL A2A 2E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 03 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 129 Lincoln Rd
Central Health Consultants
Grand Falls-Windsor NL A2A 1P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Union St
Central Newfoundland Regional Health Centre
Grand Falls-Windsor NL A2A 2E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 03 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FADY KYROLOS EMAD KAMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FADY KYROLOS EMAD KAMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Mar 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2017