THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:05:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sharjah, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Prince Philip Drive
Health Sciences Centre
St. John's Newfoundland and Labrador A1B 3X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 709-777-6300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: 807-684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 727 McDermot Ave
University of Manitoba
Interventional Cardiology fellow
260 Brodie Centre
Winnipeg MB R3E 3P5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sharjah, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Prince Philip Drive
Health Sciences Centre
St. John's Newfoundland and Labrador A1B 3X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 709-777-6300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: 807-684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 727 McDermot Ave
University of Manitoba
Interventional Cardiology fellow
260 Brodie Centre
Winnipeg MB R3E 3P5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UMAR ISMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMAIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UMAR ISMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMAIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sharjah, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 May 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 May 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2017