THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:37:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Himachal Pradesh University, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dr.Savita Karol
Suite 110
640-Prospect Street
Fredericton New Brunswick E3B 6M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (506) 454-0119
Fax: 506-454-7162

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Aug 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 05 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Paitents seeking a copy of their medical record may contact:
Dusk Medical Centre
1 - 55 Dusk Dr
Brampton ON L6Y 5Z6

or

Tel: 905-451-9999
Date Received: 09 Jan 2019

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Himachal Pradesh University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dr.Savita Karol
Suite 110
640-Prospect Street
Fredericton New Brunswick E3B 6M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (506) 454-0119
Fax: 506-454-7162

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Aug 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 05 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Paitents seeking a copy of their medical record may contact:
Dusk Medical Centre
1 - 55 Dusk Dr
Brampton ON L6Y 5Z6

or

Tel: 905-451-9999
Date Received: 09 Jan 2019

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAVITA KAROL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAROL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAVITA KAROL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAROL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Himachal Pradesh University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2017