THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:17:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 99 Kakulu Road
Med-Team Clinic
Suite 103
Ottawa Ontario K2L 2V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-592-1448
Fax: 613-591-3778
Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Geriatrics
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: 613-721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Extendicare Medex
1865 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3K6
Phone: 613-225-5650
Extension: 350
Fax: 613-225-0960
Address: Carleton Lodge
55 Lodge Road
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3H1
Phone: 613-580-2953
Fax: 613-825-0245
Address: 164 Maravista Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2J 5R3
Phone: (613) 515-5105
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Thorncliff Place
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9N9
Phone: 613-596-3853
Fax: 613-596-6225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 99 Kakulu Road
Med-Team Clinic
Suite 103
Ottawa Ontario K2L 2V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-592-1448
Fax: 613-591-3778
Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Geriatrics
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: 613-721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Extendicare Medex
1865 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3K6
Phone: 613-225-5650
Extension: 350
Fax: 613-225-0960
Address: Carleton Lodge
55 Lodge Road
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3H1
Phone: 613-580-2953
Fax: 613-825-0245
Address: 164 Maravista Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2J 5R3
Phone: (613) 515-5105
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Thorncliff Place
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9N9
Phone: 613-596-3853
Fax: 613-596-6225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLINS EDWARD VASQUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VASQUEZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLINS EDWARD VASQUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VASQUEZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2017