THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:33:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Aberdeen School of Medicine, Medical Sciences and Nutrition, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 22 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 22 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Aberdeen School of Medicine, Medical Sciences and Nutrition, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 22 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 22 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Aberdeen School of Medicine, Medical Sciences and Nutrition, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2023 to 19 Aug 2023
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
20 Aug 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2022 to 19 Aug 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Ottawa
PEAP - R - Orthopedic Surgery
10 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 19 Aug 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
DATE: 20 Aug 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 19 Aug 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 10 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Aug 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2017