THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:10:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nottingham, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Surgery
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-549-6666
Extension: 3678
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nottingham, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Surgery
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-549-6666
Extension: 3678
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADER MOUNIR YOUSSEF MARCOS HANNA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HANNA is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. HANNA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HANNA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. HANNA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HANNA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HANNA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADER MOUNIR YOUSSEF MARCOS HANNA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HANNA is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. HANNA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HANNA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. HANNA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HANNA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HANNA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nottingham, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
21 Dec 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator Program
26 Oct 2021 to 20 Dec 2021
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2021 to 25 Oct 2021
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator Program
02 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2019 to 01 Sep 2019
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
27 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Queen's University
AVP - General Surgery
04 Apr 2017 to 26 Jun 2017
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE: 21 Dec 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator Program
DATE: 26 Oct 2021 to 20 Dec 2021
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 25 Oct 2021
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator Program
DATE: 02 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 01 Sep 2019
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
DATE: 27 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: AVP - General Surgery
DATE: 04 Apr 2017 to 26 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2017
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2017