THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
18 Mar 2025 to 20 Apr 2025
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 17 Mar 2025
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
18 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 09 Jul 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
10 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 09 Jul 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
10 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2021 to 09 Jul 2021
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
10 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2020 to 09 Jul 2020
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
10 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2019 to 09 Jul 2019
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
10 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2018 to 09 Jul 2018
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
10 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Ottawa
PEAP - R - Pediatrics
19 Apr 2017 to 09 Jul 2017
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 18 Mar 2025 to 20 Apr 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 17 Mar 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 18 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 09 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 10 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 09 Jul 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 10 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 09 Jul 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
DATE: 10 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 09 Jul 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
DATE: 10 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 09 Jul 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE: 10 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 09 Jul 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE: 10 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Pediatrics
DATE: 19 Apr 2017 to 09 Jul 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Apr 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2017