THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:36:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2013
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology
02 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
EL - Anatomical Pathology
01 May 2017 to 28 May 2017
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 02 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 01 May 2017 to 28 May 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 May 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 May 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2017