THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:57:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American International Medical Uni, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway W
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 4167473400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI
Medical School: American International Medical Uni, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway W
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 4167473400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUNNY KIRTI SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUNNY KIRTI SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American International Medical Uni, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jan 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2018