THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:00:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Pediatric Nephrology
04 May 2020 to 15 May 2020
University of Toronto
EL - Pediatric Nephrology
10 Apr 2017 to 05 May 2017
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatric Nephrology
DATE: 04 May 2020 to 15 May 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatric Nephrology
DATE: 10 Apr 2017 to 05 May 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 May 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 May 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 May 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 May 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2017