THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:44:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 168 Brock St
Kawartha Centre - Redefining Health Aging
Peterborough ON K9H 2P4
Phone: 705 749 3906
Fax: 705 749 2778
Address: 99 Toronto Rd
GAIN Clinic
Port Hope ON L1A 3S4
Phone: 905 885 2626
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 16 Apr 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 16 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 168 Brock St
Kawartha Centre - Redefining Health Aging
Peterborough ON K9H 2P4
Phone: 705 749 3906
Fax: 705 749 2778
Address: 99 Toronto Rd
GAIN Clinic
Port Hope ON L1A 3S4
Phone: 905 885 2626
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 16 Apr 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 16 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH BRISBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRISBIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH BRISBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRISBIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Nov 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2017