THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:44:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway W
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7297
Fax: (905) 848-8313
Address: Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neuropathology
Effective: 01 May 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 13 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neuropathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 13 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway W
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7297
Fax: (905) 848-8313
Address: Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neuropathology
Effective: 01 May 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 13 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neuropathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 13 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
19 Jul 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 19 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Mohanpal Singh Dulai may practise medicine independently in anatomical
pathology and neuropathology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Mohanpal Singh Dulai may practise medicine independently in anatomical
pathology and neuropathology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Jul 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Mar 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Nov 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 May 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 May 2017