THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:44:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Otago, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Cornwall General Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Otago, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Cornwall General Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMR JAMAL ALWAKEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALWAKEEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMR JAMAL ALWAKEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALWAKEEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Otago, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Nov 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 May 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 May 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2017