THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:03:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The University of Rochester, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Phone: 519-741-5252
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The University of Rochester, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Phone: 519-741-5252
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DOMINIC RACO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RACO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DOMINIC RACO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RACO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The University of Rochester, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jul 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2017