THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:13:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Mumbai, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Mumbai, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Mumbai, 2001
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2021 to 31 Jan 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jan 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Jan 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jan 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017