THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oshawa Clinic Group
117 King St E
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 723-8551
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2-200 Brock St N
Whitby ON L1N 4H5
Phone: 905-668-3378
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 17 Oct 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robin Baweja Medical Professional Cooporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Jun 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. Robin Baweja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jun 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oshawa Clinic Group
117 King St E
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 723-8551
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2-200 Brock St N
Whitby ON L1N 4H5
Phone: 905-668-3378
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 17 Oct 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robin Baweja Medical Professional Cooporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Jun 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. Robin Baweja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jun 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Oct 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 17 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Robin Baweja may practise medicine independently in paediatrics.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Robin Baweja may practise medicine independently in paediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Oct 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 May 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 May 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 May 2017