THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:01:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 194 Talbot St W
Erie Shores Healthcare
Family Medicine
2 North
Leamington ON N8H 1N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 326-2373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 242 CAW Student Center
University of Windsor
Windsor Ontario N9B 3P4
Phone: 519-973-7002
Fax: 519-9713637

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Windsor Family Health Organization
2462 Howard Ave
Suite 120
Windsor, ON
N8X 3V6
Ph: 519-946-2194
Date Received: 13 Jul 2022

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 194 Talbot St W
Erie Shores Healthcare
Family Medicine
2 North
Leamington ON N8H 1N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 326-2373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 242 CAW Student Center
University of Windsor
Windsor Ontario N9B 3P4
Phone: 519-973-7002
Fax: 519-9713637

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Windsor Family Health Organization
2462 Howard Ave
Suite 120
Windsor, ON
N8X 3V6
Ph: 519-946-2194
Date Received: 13 Jul 2022

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW BATTISTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATTISTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW BATTISTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATTISTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017