THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:08:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main St W
McMaster University
Student Wellness Centre
PGCLL 210/201
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-525-9140
Extension: 27700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1100 Burloak Dr
Burlington ON L7L 6B2
Phone: 1-888-468-6178
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main St W
McMaster University
Student Wellness Centre
PGCLL 210/201
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-525-9140
Extension: 27700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1100 Burloak Dr
Burlington ON L7L 6B2
Phone: 1-888-468-6178
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE ONNAE WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE ONNAE WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017