THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:19:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 407-3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Clinic
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 431-5292
Fax: (416) 431-4011

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jun 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Z.Benn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jan 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 407-3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Clinic
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 431-5292
Fax: (416) 431-4011

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jun 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Z.Benn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jan 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Apr 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 11 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Zahra Michelle Benn may practise medicine independently in Pediatrics.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Zahra Michelle Benn may practise medicine independently in Pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2017