THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:18:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Aga Khan University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Trafalgar Rd
Oakville ON L6H 7H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 547 Queen St
Chatham ON N7M 2J4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Mar 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Aga Khan University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Trafalgar Rd
Oakville ON L6H 7H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 547 Queen St
Chatham ON N7M 2J4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Mar 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 Aug 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ZOHAIR MAPARA may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ZOHAIR MAPARA may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Aga Khan University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Aug 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 May 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 May 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 May 2017