THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:53:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11220 83 Avenue Northwest
Mazankowski Heart Institute
Division of Cardiology
Edmonton Alberta T6G 2B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11220 83 Avenue Northwest
Mazankowski Heart Institute
Division of Cardiology
Edmonton Alberta T6G 2B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE-ELISABETH BOUTET shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BOUTET is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. BOUTET shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BOUTET is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BOUTET shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BOUTET is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BOUTET no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE-ELISABETH BOUTET shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BOUTET is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. BOUTET shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BOUTET is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BOUTET shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BOUTET is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BOUTET no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
14 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
EL - Cardiology
06 Apr 2020 to 03 May 2020
University of Ottawa
EL - Cardiology
10 Feb 2020 to 08 Mar 2020
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 14 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Cardiology
DATE: 06 Apr 2020 to 03 May 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Cardiology
DATE: 10 Feb 2020 to 08 Mar 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 May 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Mar 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 May 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017