THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:10:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-785-2500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 80 Workman Way
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Geriatric Psychiatry
First floor
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Phone: 416-535-8501
Extension: 33448
Fax: 416-583-1296

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Mar 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 23 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-785-2500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 80 Workman Way
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Geriatric Psychiatry
First floor
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Phone: 416-535-8501
Extension: 33448
Fax: 416-583-1296

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Mar 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 23 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL HEATHER CARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL HEATHER CARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Oct 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017