THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:35:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Hematology
Box 201a
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137378899
Extension: 73756
Fax: 6137378861

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 02 Nov 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Hematology
Box 201a
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137378899
Extension: 73756
Fax: 6137378861

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 02 Nov 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TYLER EDWARD JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TYLER EDWARD JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017