THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:35:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2555 St. Joseph Blvd
Orléans ON K1C 1S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 830-1298
Fax: (613) 830-2170
Address: 713 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: 6137464621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 548 Byrne Rd
Stanton Territorial Hospital
P.O. box 10
Yellowknife NT X1A 0H1
Phone: 867-767-9300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2555 St. Joseph Blvd
Orléans ON K1C 1S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 830-1298
Fax: (613) 830-2170
Address: 713 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: 6137464621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 548 Byrne Rd
Stanton Territorial Hospital
P.O. box 10
Yellowknife NT X1A 0H1
Phone: 867-767-9300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SITELLE LEONIE CHESKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHESKEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SITELLE LEONIE CHESKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHESKEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Nov 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017