THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:22:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National and Kapodistrian Univ of Athens, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National and Kapodistrian Univ of Athens, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SPYRIDON KARADIMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARADIMAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SPYRIDON KARADIMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARADIMAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National and Kapodistrian Univ of Athens, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 May 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017