THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:12:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: Boghosian, Krista (Used Until: 16 Aug 2022)
Medical School: Queen's University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARMENIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 373 Commissioners Road West
London Ontario N6J 1Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-5559
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: Boghosian, Krista (Used Until: 16 Aug 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARMENIAN
Medical School: Queen's University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 373 Commissioners Road West
London Ontario N6J 1Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-5559
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTA TAMAR CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTA TAMAR CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017