THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:57:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
ER Physicians' Lounge
RFE-GS-480
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: (416) 340-4300
Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
Emergency Department
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Phone: 9053726811
Fax: No Information Available
Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Emergency Department
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3496
Fax: No Information Available
Address: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Emergency Department
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: 4166032581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 04 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Law USA - California
PROFESSION: Law
JURISDICTION: USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
ER Physicians' Lounge
RFE-GS-480
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: (416) 340-4300
Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
Emergency Department
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Phone: 9053726811
Fax: No Information Available
Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Emergency Department
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3496
Fax: No Information Available
Address: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Emergency Department
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: 4166032581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 04 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Law USA - California
PROFESSION: Law
JURISDICTION: USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TESSA MIRIAM JAMIE RINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RINGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TESSA MIRIAM JAMIE RINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RINGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017