THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:18:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 622 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6G 1K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 483-1502
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 240 Duncan Mill Road
Kidcrew Medical
Toronto Ontario M3B 3S6
Phone: (416) 654-5437
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 401-1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W1
Phone: (416) 224-1922
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 622 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6G 1K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 483-1502
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 240 Duncan Mill Road
Kidcrew Medical
Toronto Ontario M3B 3S6
Phone: (416) 654-5437
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 401-1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W1
Phone: (416) 224-1922
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DJURDJA DJORDJEVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DJORDJEVIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DJURDJA DJORDJEVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DJORDJEVIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2024
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017