THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:51:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Queen St W
CAMH
Unit 3-4
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165358501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
SHN - Centenary Site
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: 4162848131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deep Jaiswal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jaiswal (CPSO#: 112318 )
Business Address: 1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Queen St W
CAMH
Unit 3-4
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165358501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
SHN - Centenary Site
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: 4162848131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deep Jaiswal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jaiswal (CPSO#: 112318 )
Business Address: 1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEEP JAISWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAISWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEEP JAISWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAISWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017