THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:57:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 140 The Esplanade
Toronto Ontario M5A 4P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 80 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1X2
Phone: 416-864-5231
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 486 Front Street West
HealthOne
Medical Walk-In Clinic
Unit 14
Toronto Ontario M5V 0V2
Phone: (647) 925-6005
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Feb 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 29 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 140 The Esplanade
Toronto Ontario M5A 4P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 80 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1X2
Phone: 416-864-5231
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 486 Front Street West
HealthOne
Medical Walk-In Clinic
Unit 14
Toronto Ontario M5V 0V2
Phone: (647) 925-6005
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Feb 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 29 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAN YAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAN YAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017