THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:18:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2022 to 08 Feb 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
09 Feb 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2021 to 08 Feb 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
09 Feb 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2020 to 08 Feb 2021
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
11 Feb 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2019 to 10 Feb 2020
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
23 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Ottawa
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2017 to 22 Sep 2017
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 08 Feb 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 09 Feb 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 08 Feb 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 09 Feb 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 08 Feb 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 11 Feb 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 10 Feb 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 23 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Sep 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Feb 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017