THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:59:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Toronto
Department of Psychiatry
250 College Street, 8th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 979-6948
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Toronto
Department of Psychiatry
250 College Street, 8th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 979-6948
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAPHNE GWENDOLYNNE DOBLE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. DOBLE is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. DOBLE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DOBLE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DOBLE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. DOBLE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. DOBLE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAPHNE GWENDOLYNNE DOBLE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. DOBLE is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. DOBLE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DOBLE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DOBLE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. DOBLE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. DOBLE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
04 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 03 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
02 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2023 to 01 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
02 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2022 to 01 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
02 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2021 to 01 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 04 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 03 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 02 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 01 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 02 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 01 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 02 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 01 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017