THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:14:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Britain Boulevard
Bldg 25
1 Canadian Air Division Headquarters
Division Surgeon Office
Winnipeg Manitoba R3J 3Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2048332500
Extension: 5430
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Britain Boulevard
Bldg 25
1 Canadian Air Division Headquarters
Division Surgeon Office
Winnipeg Manitoba R3J 3Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2048332500
Extension: 5430
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOELLE LYNN THORGRIMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THORGRIMSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOELLE LYNN THORGRIMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THORGRIMSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017