THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:51:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Univ of Singapore, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE, FUKIEN, INDONESIAN, MALAY, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Centrepointe Dr
Nepean Medical Center
suite 101
Nepean ON K2G 6E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6133218022
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 24 Sep 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Seang Lin Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Mar 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE, FUKIEN, INDONESIAN, MALAY, MANDARIN
Medical School: Univ of Singapore, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Centrepointe Dr
Nepean Medical Center
suite 101
Nepean ON K2G 6E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6133218022
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 24 Sep 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Seang Lin Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Mar 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEANG LIN TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEANG LIN TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Univ of Singapore, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2017