THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:42:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Jaffna, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Qualcare Family Medical Centre
Unit #102
9249 Kennedy Road
Markham Ontario L3R 6H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 604 3238
Fax: (365) 509 2208

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Senthiru Sivaganeshan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jan 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Jaffna, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Qualcare Family Medical Centre
Unit #102
9249 Kennedy Road
Markham Ontario L3R 6H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 604 3238
Fax: (365) 509 2208

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Senthiru Sivaganeshan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jan 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SENTHIRU SIVAGANESHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVAGANESHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SENTHIRU SIVAGANESHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVAGANESHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Jaffna, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2017