THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:20:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARMENIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 123 Edward St
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 971-7730
Fax: (416) 408-2802

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Jul 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARMENIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 123 Edward St
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 971-7730
Fax: (416) 408-2802

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Jul 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARNI TATIKIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TATIKIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARNI TATIKIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TATIKIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017