THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:51:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2175 Richmond Street
Suite #4
London Ontario N6G 3V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 850-5454
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2175 Richmond Street
Suite #4
London Ontario N6G 3V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 850-5454
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA BLICHOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLICHOWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA BLICHOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLICHOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017